THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:04:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 201
8760 Jane Street
Concord Ontario L4K 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 597-3724
Fax: (905) 597-3726

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicoletta Bonafede Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bonafede (CPSO#: 65450 )
Business Address: 8760 Jane Street
Suite 201
Vaughan Ontario L4K 2M9
(905) 597-3724

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 201
8760 Jane Street
Concord Ontario L4K 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 597-3724
Fax: (905) 597-3726

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicoletta Bonafede Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bonafede (CPSO#: 65450 )
Business Address: 8760 Jane Street
Suite 201
Vaughan Ontario L4K 2M9
(905) 597-3724

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLETTA BONAFEDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONAFEDE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLETTA BONAFEDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONAFEDE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992