THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:33:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Champagne Dr
Unit A2
North York ON M3J 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-222-6160
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2 Champagne Dr
North York Endoscopy Centre
North York ON M3J 0K2
Phone: 416-645-5145
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Phone: 416-645-5668
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medicine
D474
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100
Extension: 2007
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cooper (CPSO#: 65460 )
Business Address: Suite 103
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
(807) 767-7211
Business Address: 5 Fairview Mall Dr
Suite 197
North York ON M2J 2Z1
416-490-8088

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Champagne Dr
Unit A2
North York ON M3J 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-222-6160
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2 Champagne Dr
North York Endoscopy Centre
North York ON M3J 0K2
Phone: 416-645-5145
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Phone: 416-645-5668
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medicine
D474
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100
Extension: 2007
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cooper (CPSO#: 65460 )
Business Address: Suite 103
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
(807) 767-7211
Business Address: 5 Fairview Mall Dr
Suite 197
North York ON M2J 2Z1
416-490-8088

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY ANNE COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY ANNE COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992