THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:44:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Kingstone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kingstone (CPSO#: 65468 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 737-8571

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Kingstone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kingstone (CPSO#: 65468 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 737-8571

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL STEVEN KINGSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KINGSTONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL STEVEN KINGSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KINGSTONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992