THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:14:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-6910
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doctor Sara Pendergast Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pendergast (CPSO#: 65477 )
Business Address: 3570 King Street East
Waterloo Ontario N2A 2W1
(519) 749-4242
Business Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 749-6910

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-6910
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doctor Sara Pendergast Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pendergast (CPSO#: 65477 )
Business Address: 3570 King Street East
Waterloo Ontario N2A 2W1
(519) 749-4242
Business Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 749-6910

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA REBECCA PENDERGAST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENDERGAST is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA REBECCA PENDERGAST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENDERGAST is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992