THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:57:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Cardiac Institute
201 - 1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dennis S. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wong (CPSO#: 65490 )
Business Address: 201 - 1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 0W7
(519) 645-0146

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Cardiac Institute
201 - 1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dennis S. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wong (CPSO#: 65490 )
Business Address: 201 - 1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 0W7
(519) 645-0146

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENNIS SHONN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENNIS SHONN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992