THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:08:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department Of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 14347
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.S. Gee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gee (CPSO#: 65498 )
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 722-7000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department Of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 14347
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.S. Gee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gee (CPSO#: 65498 )
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 722-7000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW STUART GEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW STUART GEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 20 Nov 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 May 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 1997

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992