THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:27:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 527 Causley Street
PO Box 1450
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 356-1666
Fax: (705) 356-2403
Address: 12A Woodward Avenue
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
Phone: (705) 350-2772
Fax: (705) 356-2403

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Sault Area Hospitals Thessalon Site Thessalon
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Sault Area Hospitals Richard's Landing Site Richards Landing
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospitals Thessalon Site
LOCATION: Thessalon

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospitals Richard's Landing Site
LOCATION: Richards Landing

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Shamas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shamas (CPSO#: 65500 )
Business Address: Blind River Family Medical Clinic
527 Causley Street
PO Box 1450
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
(705) 356-1666
Business Address: 12A Woodward
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
(705) 356-2772

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 527 Causley Street
PO Box 1450
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 356-1666
Fax: (705) 356-2403
Address: 12A Woodward Avenue
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
Phone: (705) 350-2772
Fax: (705) 356-2403

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Sault Area Hospitals Thessalon Site Thessalon
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Sault Area Hospitals Richard's Landing Site Richards Landing
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospitals Thessalon Site
LOCATION: Thessalon

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospitals Richard's Landing Site
LOCATION: Richards Landing

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Shamas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shamas (CPSO#: 65500 )
Business Address: Blind River Family Medical Clinic
527 Causley Street
PO Box 1450
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
(705) 356-1666
Business Address: 12A Woodward
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
(705) 356-2772

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY ELIZABETH SHAMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY ELIZABETH SHAMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992