THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:12:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3080 Yonge Street
Suite 5080
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-782-4447
Fax: 416-782-1284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Margaret H. Bennett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bennett (CPSO#: 65509 )
Business Address: Suite 5080
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N1
(416) 782-4447

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3080 Yonge Street
Suite 5080
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-782-4447
Fax: 416-782-1284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Margaret H. Bennett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bennett (CPSO#: 65509 )
Business Address: Suite 5080
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N1
(416) 782-4447

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET HOPE BENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENNETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET HOPE BENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENNETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992