THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:21:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Punjab University India, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057216199
Extension: 5441
Fax: (905) 721-6685
Address: Age Care Samac Long Term Care Home
451 Woodmount Dr.
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8E3
Phone: (905) 571-0065
Fax: (905) 579-3256

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ripple Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dhillon (CPSO#: 65519 )
Business Address: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K4
(905) 721-4300 Extn: 5441
Business Address: 431 Woodmount Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8E3
(905) 721-4300 Extn: 5441
Business Address: 590 Oshawa Blvd N
Hillsdale Estates LTCH
Oshawa ON L1G 5T9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Punjab University India, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057216199
Extension: 5441
Fax: (905) 721-6685
Address: Age Care Samac Long Term Care Home
451 Woodmount Dr.
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8E3
Phone: (905) 571-0065
Fax: (905) 579-3256

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ripple Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dhillon (CPSO#: 65519 )
Business Address: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K4
(905) 721-4300 Extn: 5441
Business Address: 431 Woodmount Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8E3
(905) 721-4300 Extn: 5441
Business Address: 590 Oshawa Blvd N
Hillsdale Estates LTCH
Oshawa ON L1G 5T9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIPPLE DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIPPLE DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Punjab University India, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992