THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:11:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 309-383 Parkdale Ave
378 Second Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4R4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-724-5852
Fax: 613-724-9965

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Claudia Hubbes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hubbes (CPSO#: 65520 )
Business Address: 309 - 383 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4R4
(613) 724-5852

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 309-383 Parkdale Ave
378 Second Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4R4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-724-5852
Fax: 613-724-9965

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Claudia Hubbes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hubbes (CPSO#: 65520 )
Business Address: 309 - 383 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4R4
(613) 724-5852

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLAUDIA HUBBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUBBES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLAUDIA HUBBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUBBES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992