THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:00:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray St
Room L1 - 040
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 5151
Fax: (416) 586-8789
Address: 1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1W9
Phone: (905) 212-9482
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ground Floor #3
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-9626
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DB Yan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yan (CPSO#: 65532 )
Business Address: 60 Murray Street
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
4165864800
Business Address: 700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
416 977 8194
Business Address: 1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1W9
905 212 9482

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray St
Room L1 - 040
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 5151
Fax: (416) 586-8789
Address: 1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1W9
Phone: (905) 212-9482
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ground Floor #3
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-9626
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DB Yan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yan (CPSO#: 65532 )
Business Address: 60 Murray Street
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
4165864800
Business Address: 700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
416 977 8194
Business Address: 1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1W9
905 212 9482

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID BENEDICT YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID BENEDICT YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992