THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:24:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6420 Beatty Line North
Upper Grand Family Health Team
Suite 202
Fergus ON N1M 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 846-5841
Fax: (519) 846-8453

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Roach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Roach (CPSO#: 65535 )
Business Address: 6420 Beatty Line
Suite 202
Fergus Ontario N1M 2W3
Business Address: 801 St. David Street North
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L1
(519) 787-2940
Business Address: 70 Victoria Street
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
(519) 846-5841
Business Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W2
(519) 843-2010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6420 Beatty Line North
Upper Grand Family Health Team
Suite 202
Fergus ON N1M 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 846-5841
Fax: (519) 846-8453

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Roach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Roach (CPSO#: 65535 )
Business Address: 6420 Beatty Line
Suite 202
Fergus Ontario N1M 2W3
Business Address: 801 St. David Street North
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L1
(519) 787-2940
Business Address: 70 Victoria Street
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
(519) 846-5841
Business Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W2
(519) 843-2010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS WILSON ROACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROACH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS WILSON ROACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROACH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992