THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:19:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph Family Medicine Clinic
2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Suite 104
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 830-1298
Fax: (613) 830-2170
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
general campus
501 Smyth Rd.
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Seale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Seale (CPSO#: 65537 )
Business Address: 100 - 2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1C 1S6
(613) 830-1218

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph Family Medicine Clinic
2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Suite 104
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 830-1298
Fax: (613) 830-2170
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
general campus
501 Smyth Rd.
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Seale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Seale (CPSO#: 65537 )
Business Address: 100 - 2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1C 1S6
(613) 830-1218

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD RANDALL SEALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEALE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD RANDALL SEALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEALE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992