THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:48:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Iran, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Nuclear Medicine
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 13350
Fax: (613) 761-4041
Address: Merivale Medical Imaging Inc
1370 Clyde Avenue
Nepean Ontario K2G 3H8
Phone: (613) 727-1072
Extension: 250
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Bazarjani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bazarjani (CPSO#: 65548 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Nuclear Medicine
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: Merivale Medical Imaging Inc
1370 Clyde Avenue
Nepean Ontario K2G 3H8
(613) 727-1072 Extn: 250

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Iran, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Nuclear Medicine
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 13350
Fax: (613) 761-4041
Address: Merivale Medical Imaging Inc
1370 Clyde Avenue
Nepean Ontario K2G 3H8
Phone: (613) 727-1072
Extension: 250
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Bazarjani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bazarjani (CPSO#: 65548 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Nuclear Medicine
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: Merivale Medical Imaging Inc
1370 Clyde Avenue
Nepean Ontario K2G 3H8
(613) 727-1072 Extn: 250

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SADROLLAH SEIFOLLAHI BAZARJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAZARJANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SADROLLAH SEIFOLLAHI BAZARJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAZARJANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Iran, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992