THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:10:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4303 Village Centre Court
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 1S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 949 6999
Fax: (905)949 6908

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Essam Michael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Michael (CPSO#: 65577 )
Business Address: 4303 Village Centre Crt 905 949 6999

Corporation Name: Dr. Essam Michael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4303 Village Centre Court
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 1S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 949 6999
Fax: (905)949 6908

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Essam Michael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Michael (CPSO#: 65577 )
Business Address: 4303 Village Centre Crt 905 949 6999

Corporation Name: Dr. Essam Michael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ESSAM SAMY NAGUIB MICHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHAEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ESSAM SAMY NAGUIB MICHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHAEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 08 Sep 2020
Summary of Decision:
On September 8., 2020, on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Essam Samy Naguib Michael (“Dr. Michael”) committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise.
 
FACTS
 
Dr. Michael is a 61-year-old obstetrician and gynecologist practicing in the Greater Toronto Area. He received his certificate authorizing independent practice from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”) in 1994.

At the relevant time, Dr. Michael operated 4 fertility clinics in the Greater Toronto Area. His primary clinic was located in Mississauga, with other offices in Brampton, Bolton, and Milton.
 
Provincial Offence Proceeding and Conviction
 
On November 14, 2018, Dr. Michael pleaded guilty to contravening s. 15 of the Health Insurance Act by submitting billings to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”), in the amount of $545,000, which did not comply with the requirements of the Schedule of Benefits, thereby committing an offence under the Health Insurance Act. The overbilling occurred over the period between January 1, 2007 and May 21, 2013.

The proceeding took place at the Superior Court of Justice before Justice Dawson. The parties presented an Agreed Statement of Fact, which was read into the record. The Agreed Statement of Fact can be summarized as follows:

- Billing code A935 requires that the physician spend a minimum of 50 minutes in direct contact with the patient;

- Between January 1, 2007 and May 21, 2013, Dr. Michael improperly billed OHIP for numerous units of code A935 as he did not spend the requisite 50 minutes in direct contact with the patient;

- There is no dispute that Dr. Michael saw the patients for whom A935 was billed. Rather than billing A935, he ought to have billed A205.

- The amount of the overpayment is the difference between the two codes, which is $545,000.

A205 is the code for an Obstetrics and Gynaecology Consultation. A205 does not have a time requirement. A935 is a Special Surgical Consultation code. It can be billed by a surgeon who provides all the appropriate elements of a regular consultation and devotes at least fifty minutes exclusively to the consultation with the patient. Dr. Michael admitted that he had submitted billings to OHIP in the amount of $545,000 that did not comply with the requirements of the Schedule of Benefits and was therefore guilty of committing an offence under the Health Insurance Act, contrary to section 44(1)(a).

At the proceeding on November 14, 2018, Dr. Michael undertook through counsel to repay the $545,000 to the Minister of Finance. A cheque from Dr. Michael’s counsel to the Minister of Finance, dated November 21, 2018 confirms restitution in the amount of $545,000.

The Crown and defence presented a joint submission on sentence, asking that the minimum fine of $5000 be imposed. Justice Dawson accepted the joint submission and ordered a fine of $5,000.
 
Circumstances of Overbilling

Dr. Michael delegated the responsibility of his OHIP billings to his staff.

Dr. Michael had inherited a billing system that allowed staff to enter shortcut keys related to the type of patient visit, rather than directly entering the OHIP code. The billing system then automatically populated billing codes based on the shortcut keys. A forensic examination of Dr. Michael’s billing software demonstrated that the billing codes associated with the shortcut keys were not always appropriate to the type of patient visit.

One of the shortcuts used by staff was for “new patient”. This shortcut was entered by staff when the visit pertained to a new fertility patient. The billing software automatically populated the A935 code when this shortcut was entered, whether or not Dr. Michael had spent the requisite 50 minutes with the patient as required by the Schedule of Benefits.

Dr. Michael was unaware of this issue and its effect on his OHIP billing. Dr. Michael nonetheless accepts responsibility for the improper billings submitted to OHIP.
 
PENALTY

Facts on Penalty

In March 2020, the William Osler Health System (“William Osler”) reduced the availability of operating rooms for elective surgeries as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic. Following this reduction in capacity, only two days per month were available for OB/GYN surgeries. It is anticipated that William Osler will increase its capacity for OB/GYN surgeries to one day per week beginning in September 2020.

As a result of the reduction in operating room capacity between March and September 2020, Dr. Michael has a backlog of 88 hospital-based surgeries he is scheduled to perform. These include surgeries for patients with gynecological conditions including infertility; significant pelvic pain secondary to endometriosis or large fibroids; and irregular and heavy periods related to conditions such as adenomyosis and submucosal fibroids.

Order

The Committee ordered:

-Dr. Michael is to be reprimanded;

- Dr. Michael’s certificate of registration is to be suspended for a period of one (1) month, commencing from November 15, 2020 at 12:01 a.m.

- The Registrar is to impose terms and conditions and limitations on Dr. Michael’s certificate of registration as set out in detail in the Order, (re: monitoring Dr. Michael’s OHIP billings)

- Dr. Michael is pay to the College costs in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days of the date of the Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): September 8, 2020

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 05 Feb 2019
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Essam Michael was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Submitting billings to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan that did not comply with the requirements of the Schedule of Benefits, contrary to Section15 of the Health Insurance Act (Ontario).

DATE: November 14, 2018
SENTENCE: Fine of $5,000
Dr. Michael repaid $545,000 to the Minister of Finance.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 08 Sep 2020
Summary of Decision:
On September 8., 2020, on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Essam Samy Naguib Michael (“Dr. Michael”) committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise.
 
FACTS
 
Dr. Michael is a 61-year-old obstetrician and gynecologist practicing in the Greater Toronto Area. He received his certificate authorizing independent practice from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”) in 1994.

At the relevant time, Dr. Michael operated 4 fertility clinics in the Greater Toronto Area. His primary clinic was located in Mississauga, with other offices in Brampton, Bolton, and Milton.
 
Provincial Offence Proceeding and Conviction
 
On November 14, 2018, Dr. Michael pleaded guilty to contravening s. 15 of the Health Insurance Act by submitting billings to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”), in the amount of $545,000, which did not comply with the requirements of the Schedule of Benefits, thereby committing an offence under the Health Insurance Act. The overbilling occurred over the period between January 1, 2007 and May 21, 2013.

The proceeding took place at the Superior Court of Justice before Justice Dawson. The parties presented an Agreed Statement of Fact, which was read into the record. The Agreed Statement of Fact can be summarized as follows:

- Billing code A935 requires that the physician spend a minimum of 50 minutes in direct contact with the patient;

- Between January 1, 2007 and May 21, 2013, Dr. Michael improperly billed OHIP for numerous units of code A935 as he did not spend the requisite 50 minutes in direct contact with the patient;

- There is no dispute that Dr. Michael saw the patients for whom A935 was billed. Rather than billing A935, he ought to have billed A205.

- The amount of the overpayment is the difference between the two codes, which is $545,000.

A205 is the code for an Obstetrics and Gynaecology Consultation. A205 does not have a time requirement. A935 is a Special Surgical Consultation code. It can be billed by a surgeon who provides all the appropriate elements of a regular consultation and devotes at least fifty minutes exclusively to the consultation with the patient. Dr. Michael admitted that he had submitted billings to OHIP in the amount of $545,000 that did not comply with the requirements of the Schedule of Benefits and was therefore guilty of committing an offence under the Health Insurance Act, contrary to section 44(1)(a).

At the proceeding on November 14, 2018, Dr. Michael undertook through counsel to repay the $545,000 to the Minister of Finance. A cheque from Dr. Michael’s counsel to the Minister of Finance, dated November 21, 2018 confirms restitution in the amount of $545,000.

The Crown and defence presented a joint submission on sentence, asking that the minimum fine of $5000 be imposed. Justice Dawson accepted the joint submission and ordered a fine of $5,000.
 
Circumstances of Overbilling

Dr. Michael delegated the responsibility of his OHIP billings to his staff.

Dr. Michael had inherited a billing system that allowed staff to enter shortcut keys related to the type of patient visit, rather than directly entering the OHIP code. The billing system then automatically populated billing codes based on the shortcut keys. A forensic examination of Dr. Michael’s billing software demonstrated that the billing codes associated with the shortcut keys were not always appropriate to the type of patient visit.

One of the shortcuts used by staff was for “new patient”. This shortcut was entered by staff when the visit pertained to a new fertility patient. The billing software automatically populated the A935 code when this shortcut was entered, whether or not Dr. Michael had spent the requisite 50 minutes with the patient as required by the Schedule of Benefits.

Dr. Michael was unaware of this issue and its effect on his OHIP billing. Dr. Michael nonetheless accepts responsibility for the improper billings submitted to OHIP.
 
PENALTY

Facts on Penalty

In March 2020, the William Osler Health System (“William Osler”) reduced the availability of operating rooms for elective surgeries as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic. Following this reduction in capacity, only two days per month were available for OB/GYN surgeries. It is anticipated that William Osler will increase its capacity for OB/GYN surgeries to one day per week beginning in September 2020.

As a result of the reduction in operating room capacity between March and September 2020, Dr. Michael has a backlog of 88 hospital-based surgeries he is scheduled to perform. These include surgeries for patients with gynecological conditions including infertility; significant pelvic pain secondary to endometriosis or large fibroids; and irregular and heavy periods related to conditions such as adenomyosis and submucosal fibroids.

Order

The Committee ordered:

-Dr. Michael is to be reprimanded;

- Dr. Michael’s certificate of registration is to be suspended for a period of one (1) month, commencing from November 15, 2020 at 12:01 a.m.

- The Registrar is to impose terms and conditions and limitations on Dr. Michael’s certificate of registration as set out in detail in the Order, (re: monitoring Dr. Michael’s OHIP billings)

- Dr. Michael is pay to the College costs in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days of the date of the Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): September 8, 2020

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 05 Feb 2019
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Essam Michael was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Submitting billings to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan that did not comply with the requirements of the Schedule of Benefits, contrary to Section15 of the Health Insurance Act (Ontario).

DATE: November 14, 2018
SENTENCE: Fine of $5,000
Dr. Michael repaid $545,000 to the Minister of Finance.

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2022
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 15 Dec 2020
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992