THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:23:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 207
440 Boler Road
London Ontario N6K 4L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 472-1846
Fax: (519) 472-4453

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hostetler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hostetler (CPSO#: 65583 )
Business Address: Suite 207
440 Boler Road
London Ontario N6K 4L2
(519) 472-1846

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 207
440 Boler Road
London Ontario N6K 4L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 472-1846
Fax: (519) 472-4453

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hostetler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hostetler (CPSO#: 65583 )
Business Address: Suite 207
440 Boler Road
London Ontario N6K 4L2
(519) 472-1846

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON LEE HOSTETLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSTETLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON LEE HOSTETLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSTETLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992