THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:54:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CODSELL MEDICAL
1 Codsell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 398-7355
Fax: (416) 398-7353

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Juda Habot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Todd (CPSO#: 65604 ) Dr. J. Habot (CPSO#: 65575 )
Business Address: Codsell Medical
1 Codsell Avenue
Lower Level
Toronto Ontario M3H 3Y6
(647) 699-9800
Business Address: Southlake Regional Healthcare Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 885-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CODSELL MEDICAL
1 Codsell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 398-7355
Fax: (416) 398-7353

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Juda Habot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Todd (CPSO#: 65604 ) Dr. J. Habot (CPSO#: 65575 )
Business Address: Codsell Medical
1 Codsell Avenue
Lower Level
Toronto Ontario M3H 3Y6
(647) 699-9800
Business Address: Southlake Regional Healthcare Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 885-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDITH MARY TODD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TODD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDITH MARY TODD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TODD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 19 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992