THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:03:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital Site
237 Barton Street East
Level 1, Room 1-90
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 46111
Fax: (905) 577-8027

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John K. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yamamura (CPSO#: 65636 ) Dr. J. Marshall (CPSO#: 65428 )
Business Address: 1280 Main Street West
Suite 2F59
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 76782

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital Site
237 Barton Street East
Level 1, Room 1-90
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 46111
Fax: (905) 577-8027

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John K. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yamamura (CPSO#: 65636 ) Dr. J. Marshall (CPSO#: 65428 )
Business Address: 1280 Main Street West
Suite 2F59
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 76782

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH LYNN REIKO YAMAMURA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAMAMURA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH LYNN REIKO YAMAMURA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAMAMURA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992