THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:06:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-806 Gordon St
Guelph ON N1G 1Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-836-1455
Fax: 519-836-1321

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John L. Laird Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Laird (CPSO#: 65643 )
Business Address: Suite 207
55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph Ontario N1H 7T8
(519) 836-1455
Business Address: 102-806 Gordon St
Guelph ON N1G 1Y7
519-836-1455

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-806 Gordon St
Guelph ON N1G 1Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-836-1455
Fax: 519-836-1321

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John L. Laird Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Laird (CPSO#: 65643 )
Business Address: Suite 207
55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph Ontario N1H 7T8
(519) 836-1455
Business Address: 102-806 Gordon St
Guelph ON N1G 1Y7
519-836-1455

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN LINCOLN LAIRD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAIRD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN LINCOLN LAIRD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAIRD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992