THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:25:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 - 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (519) 371-7474
Fax: (519) 371-8585

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nuri Kaal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kaal (CPSO#: 65656 )
Business Address: 1199 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 1G6
(519) 396-3331
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Suite 7107
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 371-7474

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 - 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (519) 371-7474
Fax: (519) 371-8585

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nuri Kaal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kaal (CPSO#: 65656 )
Business Address: 1199 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 1G6
(519) 396-3331
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Suite 7107
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 371-7474

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NURI ISSA MOHAMED BELKASIM KAAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NURI ISSA MOHAMED BELKASIM KAAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 09 Dec 2015
Summary:
Effective July 10, 2017, Dr. Kaal has completed all elements of this SCERP.
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 09 Dec 2015
Summary:
Effective July 10, 2017, Dr. Kaal has completed all elements of this SCERP.
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992