THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:42:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4203
Fax: (416) 480-6818

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ralph B. Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lewis (CPSO#: 65705 )
Business Address: Department of Psychiatry
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room FG62
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4098

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4203
Fax: (416) 480-6818

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ralph B. Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lewis (CPSO#: 65705 )
Business Address: Department of Psychiatry
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room FG62
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4098

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RALPH BRETT LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RALPH BRETT LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992