THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:53:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAGALOG

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients can access a copy of their medical record by contacting:

Record Storage and Retreival Services
111 St Regis Cres. South
Toronto, ON
M3J 1Y6
Phone: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 13 Feb 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cesar P. Garcia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Garcia (CPSO#: 65706 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAGALOG
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients can access a copy of their medical record by contacting:

Record Storage and Retreival Services
111 St Regis Cres. South
Toronto, ON
M3J 1Y6
Phone: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 13 Feb 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cesar P. Garcia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Garcia (CPSO#: 65706 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CESAR PANTALEON GARCIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARCIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CESAR PANTALEON GARCIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARCIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 1996

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992