THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:00:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M2N 6S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162254440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 304
2347 kennedy rd
Scarborough Ontario M1T 3T8
Phone: 416-754-1010
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahmoud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mahmoud (CPSO#: 65711 )
Business Address: 25 Sheppard Ave W
2347 kennedy Rd , Scarborough ,Ontario M1T 3T8
The Scarborough hospital
North York ON M2N 6S6
4162254440
Business Address: Suite 207
2347 Kennedy Road
Scarborough Ontario M1T 3T8
(416) 332-8128

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M2N 6S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162254440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 304
2347 kennedy rd
Scarborough Ontario M1T 3T8
Phone: 416-754-1010
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahmoud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mahmoud (CPSO#: 65711 )
Business Address: 25 Sheppard Ave W
2347 kennedy Rd , Scarborough ,Ontario M1T 3T8
The Scarborough hospital
North York ON M2N 6S6
4162254440
Business Address: Suite 207
2347 Kennedy Road
Scarborough Ontario M1T 3T8
(416) 332-8128

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAIDAR ABBAS MAHMOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHMOUD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAIDAR ABBAS MAHMOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHMOUD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992