THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:35:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4532 Credit Pointe Dr
Mississauga Ontario L5M 3M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 991-9475
Fax: (905) 848-8183
Address: 100 International Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9W 6J6
Phone: 416-675-4530
Extension: 42753
Fax: 416-213-4206

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kamel (CPSO#: 65725 )
Business Address: 4532 Credit Pointe Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5M 3M2
(647) 991-9475

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4532 Credit Pointe Dr
Mississauga Ontario L5M 3M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 991-9475
Fax: (905) 848-8183
Address: 100 International Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9W 6J6
Phone: 416-675-4530
Extension: 42753
Fax: 416-213-4206

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kamel (CPSO#: 65725 )
Business Address: 4532 Credit Pointe Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5M 3M2
(647) 991-9475

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONA KAMEL KAMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONA KAMEL KAMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1992