THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:29:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
2409 Yonge street
Toronto Ontario M5M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 787-3771
Fax: (416) 782-3030
Address: Henrietta Banting Breast Center
Women's college hospital
76 Grenville Street 5th floor ,
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6225
Fax: (416) 323-7730

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catz-Biro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Catz-Biro (CPSO#: 65788 )
Business Address: Suite 203
2409 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E7
(416) 787-3771

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
2409 Yonge street
Toronto Ontario M5M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 787-3771
Fax: (416) 782-3030
Address: Henrietta Banting Breast Center
Women's college hospital
76 Grenville Street 5th floor ,
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6225
Fax: (416) 323-7730

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catz-Biro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Catz-Biro (CPSO#: 65788 )
Business Address: Suite 203
2409 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E7
(416) 787-3771

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA CATZ-BIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATZ-BIRO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA CATZ-BIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATZ-BIRO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 1992