THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:33:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 139 Greenbank Road
Suite 102
Nepean Ontario K2H 9A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 829-2031
Fax: (613) 829-2274

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shane Munro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Munro (CPSO#: 65800 )
Business Address: 102 - 139 Greenbank Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 9A5
(613) 829-2031

Corporation Name: Munro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Mar 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 139 Greenbank Road
Suite 102
Nepean Ontario K2H 9A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 829-2031
Fax: (613) 829-2274

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shane Munro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Munro (CPSO#: 65800 )
Business Address: 102 - 139 Greenbank Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 9A5
(613) 829-2031

Corporation Name: Munro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Mar 2013

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANE MATTHEW MUNRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNRO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANE MATTHEW MUNRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNRO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1992
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1992