THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:59:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grey Bruce Regional Health Centre
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Phillip Lalande Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lalande (CPSO#: 65803 )
Business Address: Grey Bruce Health Service
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grey Bruce Regional Health Centre
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Phillip Lalande Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lalande (CPSO#: 65803 )
Business Address: Grey Bruce Health Service
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILLIP DAVID NATHANIEL LALANDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALANDE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILLIP DAVID NATHANIEL LALANDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALANDE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1992