THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:59:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cornwall Community Hospital
McConnell Site
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-938-4240
Extension: 4420
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Glengarry Memorial Hospital
20260 Country Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Cornwall Radiology Associates
Suite 116
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
Phone: (613) 933-7255
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boubalos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boubalos (CPSO#: 65899 )
Business Address: 840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall Community Hospital
Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
6139384240
Business Address: 116-820 McConnell Ave
Cornwall Radiology Associates Inc.
Cornwall ON K6H 4M4
6139337255
Business Address: 20260 County Road 43
Alexandria ON K0C 1A0

Corporation Name: Dr. Boubalos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Mar 2023

Corporation Name: A. Boubalos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Apr 2015

Corporation Name: Boubalos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Feb 2011

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GREEK
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cornwall Community Hospital
McConnell Site
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-938-4240
Extension: 4420
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Glengarry Memorial Hospital
20260 Country Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Cornwall Radiology Associates
Suite 116
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
Phone: (613) 933-7255
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boubalos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boubalos (CPSO#: 65899 )
Business Address: 840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall Community Hospital
Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
6139384240
Business Address: 116-820 McConnell Ave
Cornwall Radiology Associates Inc.
Cornwall ON K6H 4M4
6139337255
Business Address: 20260 County Road 43
Alexandria ON K0C 1A0

Corporation Name: Dr. Boubalos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Mar 2023

Corporation Name: A. Boubalos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Apr 2015

Corporation Name: Boubalos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Feb 2011

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANASTASIOS BOUBALOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUBALOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANASTASIOS BOUBALOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUBALOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 17 Nov 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 1992