THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 359 Riverside Drive
Unit 105
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 1H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 670-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 66 Josephine St.
Suite 202
North Bay Ontario P1B0A7
Phone: 1705 474 6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 College Rd
North Bay Ontario P1B 8G5
Phone: 1705 4748600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 202-1950 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Z2
Phone: (705) 474-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-9193
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place Sudbury
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jean-Guy Gagnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gagnon (CPSO#: 66002 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600
Business Address: 680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
(705) 675-9192
Business Address: 907 Lorne Street
Sudbury Ontario P3C 4R6
(705) 670-2000
Business Address: 202-1950 Algonquin Ave
North Bay ON P1B 4Z2
Business Address: 66 Josephine St 705 474-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 359 Riverside Drive
Unit 105
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 1H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 670-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 66 Josephine St.
Suite 202
North Bay Ontario P1B0A7
Phone: 1705 474 6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 College Rd
North Bay Ontario P1B 8G5
Phone: 1705 4748600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 202-1950 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Z2
Phone: (705) 474-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-9193
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place Sudbury
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jean-Guy Gagnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gagnon (CPSO#: 66002 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600
Business Address: 680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
(705) 675-9192
Business Address: 907 Lorne Street
Sudbury Ontario P3C 4R6
(705) 670-2000
Business Address: 202-1950 Algonquin Ave
North Bay ON P1B 4Z2
Business Address: 66 Josephine St 705 474-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-GUY ROLAND GAGNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGNON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-GUY ROLAND GAGNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGNON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1992
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 1992