THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:17:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Larocque Road
North Bay Ontario P1B 8G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 495-3101
Fax: (705) 495-8460

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Waja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Waja (CPSO#: 66027 )
Business Address: 30 Larocque Road
North Bay Ontario P1B 8G3
(705) 495-3101

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Larocque Road
North Bay Ontario P1B 8G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 495-3101
Fax: (705) 495-8460

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Waja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Waja (CPSO#: 66027 )
Business Address: 30 Larocque Road
North Bay Ontario P1B 8G3
(705) 495-3101

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUKMAAN WAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAJA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUKMAAN WAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAJA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 1992