THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:55:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Himachal Pradesh University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301- 295 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-9531
Fax: (416) 603-2388
Address: 197 Third St
Cobourg Ontario K9A 3L5
Phone: 905-373-1227
Fax: 905-373-4062
Address: 13291 YONGE STREET, SUITE # 300
Oak Ridges Ontario L4E 4L6
Phone: 905-773-7843
Fax: (905) 773-9614
Address: 1849 Yonge Street
Unit LF 20
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
Phone: 416-920-3737
Fax: 416-920-7848
Address: Suite 301
295 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S2
Phone: (416) 603-9531
Fax: 416-603-2388
Address: 1054 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1G6
Phone: 416-746-3012
Fax: 416-746-7016
Address: 200 WINDFLOWER GATE, UNIT AA5
Vaughan Ontario L4L 9L3
Phone: 905-856-1300
Fax: 905-856-0900
Address: 55 Edinborough Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 3C3
Phone: 519-258-0585
Fax: 519-258-6304

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Satyendra Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma (CPSO#: 66085 )
Business Address: 197 Third Street
Cobourg Ontario K9A 3L5
(905) 373-1227
Business Address: 1054 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 2A7
(416) 746-3012
Business Address: 300 13291 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-7843
Business Address: Suite 101
55 Edinborough Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 3C3
Business Address: 301 - 295 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S2
(416) 603-9531

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Himachal Pradesh University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301- 295 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-9531
Fax: (416) 603-2388
Address: 197 Third St
Cobourg Ontario K9A 3L5
Phone: 905-373-1227
Fax: 905-373-4062
Address: 13291 YONGE STREET, SUITE # 300
Oak Ridges Ontario L4E 4L6
Phone: 905-773-7843
Fax: (905) 773-9614
Address: 1849 Yonge Street
Unit LF 20
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
Phone: 416-920-3737
Fax: 416-920-7848
Address: Suite 301
295 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S2
Phone: (416) 603-9531
Fax: 416-603-2388
Address: 1054 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1G6
Phone: 416-746-3012
Fax: 416-746-7016
Address: 200 WINDFLOWER GATE, UNIT AA5
Vaughan Ontario L4L 9L3
Phone: 905-856-1300
Fax: 905-856-0900
Address: 55 Edinborough Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 3C3
Phone: 519-258-0585
Fax: 519-258-6304

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Satyendra Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma (CPSO#: 66085 )
Business Address: 197 Third Street
Cobourg Ontario K9A 3L5
(905) 373-1227
Business Address: 1054 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 2A7
(416) 746-3012
Business Address: 300 13291 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-7843
Business Address: Suite 101
55 Edinborough Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 3C3
Business Address: 301 - 295 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S2
(416) 603-9531

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SATYENDRA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SATYENDRA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Himachal Pradesh University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1992
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 1992