THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:40:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 522-9101
Fax: (705) 522-5744

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For patients seeking access to their medical records or for any related inquiries, please contact Records Management LTD at:

Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Mailing Address: 1 High Meadow Place, Suite #13, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 31 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan E. Vokey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vokey (CPSO#: 66152 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 522-9101
Fax: (705) 522-5744

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For patients seeking access to their medical records or for any related inquiries, please contact Records Management LTD at:

Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Mailing Address: 1 High Meadow Place, Suite #13, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 31 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan E. Vokey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vokey (CPSO#: 66152 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN ELIZABETH VOKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOKEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN ELIZABETH VOKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOKEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1992
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 1992