THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:55:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Wing CFB Trenton
24 Canadian Forces Hosp Serv
PO Box 1000
50 Yukon Street
Astra Ontario K0K 3W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 392-2811
Extension: 3480
Fax: (613) 965-7214

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G Ducros Medicine Professional Corporate
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ducros (CPSO#: 66156 )
Business Address: 50-529 Old Highway 2
Trenton ON K8V 5P5
613-392-2811 ext 4462

Corporation Name: G. Ducros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Wing CFB Trenton
24 Canadian Forces Hosp Serv
PO Box 1000
50 Yukon Street
Astra Ontario K0K 3W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 392-2811
Extension: 3480
Fax: (613) 965-7214

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G Ducros Medicine Professional Corporate
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ducros (CPSO#: 66156 )
Business Address: 50-529 Old Highway 2
Trenton ON K8V 5P5
613-392-2811 ext 4462

Corporation Name: G. Ducros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE MARIE DUCROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUCROS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE MARIE DUCROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUCROS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 May 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Feb 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 May 1993

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 1993