THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 05:12:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 448 Welland Avenue
Better Days Clinic
Unit 4
St. Catharines Ontario L2M 7V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059321053
Fax: 9056822581

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimacovich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kimacovich (CPSO#: 66176 )
Business Address: 4-448 Welland Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2M 7V3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 448 Welland Avenue
Better Days Clinic
Unit 4
St. Catharines Ontario L2M 7V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059321053
Fax: 9056822581

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimacovich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kimacovich (CPSO#: 66176 )
Business Address: 4-448 Welland Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2M 7V3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD GLENN KIMACOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIMACOVICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD GLENN KIMACOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIMACOVICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1993
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 1993