THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:46:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luc Beauchesne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Beauchesne (CPSO#: 66228 )
Business Address: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7330

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luc Beauchesne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Beauchesne (CPSO#: 66228 )
Business Address: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7330

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUC MICHEL BEAUCHESNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUCHESNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUC MICHEL BEAUCHESNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUCHESNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1993
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 1993