THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:45:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Nacional De Trujillo, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 474 College ST, Suite 206
Toronto Ontario M6G 1A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 350-8008
Fax: (647) 350-8009

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Victor Antonio Vera Silva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Vera Silva (CPSO#: 66296 )
Business Address: Suite 206
474 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1A4
(647) 350-8008

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Nacional De Trujillo, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 474 College ST, Suite 206
Toronto Ontario M6G 1A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 350-8008
Fax: (647) 350-8009

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Victor Antonio Vera Silva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Vera Silva (CPSO#: 66296 )
Business Address: Suite 206
474 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1A4
(647) 350-8008

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTOR ANTONIO VERA SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERA SILVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTOR ANTONIO VERA SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERA SILVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Nacional De Trujillo, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 1993