THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:32:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Garyounis University, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Mersal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mersal (CPSO#: 66315 )
Business Address: 312-688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3B7
(416) 825-3716

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Garyounis University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Mersal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mersal (CPSO#: 66315 )
Business Address: 312-688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3B7
(416) 825-3716

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI YOUSSEF MERSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERSAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI YOUSSEF MERSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERSAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Garyounis University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2003
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 04 Nov 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 May 1993