THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:02:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057326111
Extension: 33016
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS
111 St. Regis Cres. South
Toronto, ON
M3J 1Y6
1-888-563-3724
Date Received: 05 Dec 2024

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. W.W. SOBKOWSKI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Sobkowski (CPSO#: 66356 )
Business Address: 1-595 Ontario Rd
Welland ON L3B 0B3
9057327544
Business Address: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
9057326111 Extn: 33016

Corporation Name: Dr. W. W. Sobkowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Aug 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057326111
Extension: 33016
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS
111 St. Regis Cres. South
Toronto, ON
M3J 1Y6
1-888-563-3724
Date Received: 05 Dec 2024

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. W.W. SOBKOWSKI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Sobkowski (CPSO#: 66356 )
Business Address: 1-595 Ontario Rd
Welland ON L3B 0B3
9057327544
Business Address: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
9057326111 Extn: 33016

Corporation Name: Dr. W. W. Sobkowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Aug 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WOJCIECH WACLAW SOBKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOBKOWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WOJCIECH WACLAW SOBKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOBKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1993
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1993