THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:09:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 102
17 King Street East
Dundas Ontario L9H 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 628-3376
Fax: (905) 628-8833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 25 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Edstrom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Edstrom (CPSO#: 66373 )
Business Address: Suite 102
17 King Street East
Dundas Ontario L9H 1B7
(905) 628-3376

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 102
17 King Street East
Dundas Ontario L9H 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 628-3376
Fax: (905) 628-8833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 25 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Edstrom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Edstrom (CPSO#: 66373 )
Business Address: Suite 102
17 King Street East
Dundas Ontario L9H 1B7
(905) 628-3376

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN DIANE EDSTROM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDSTROM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN DIANE EDSTROM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDSTROM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 22 Jul 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 22 Jul 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 29 Nov 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 1993