THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:19:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2220 Kildare Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Fax: (519) 255-8675

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Hamm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hamm (CPSO#: 66375 )
Business Address: 5198904382

Corporation Name: C. Hamm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2220 Kildare Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Fax: (519) 255-8675

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Hamm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hamm (CPSO#: 66375 )
Business Address: 5198904382

Corporation Name: C. Hamm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE MARIE HAMM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE MARIE HAMM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1993