THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:48:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Woods Road
Valhalla New York 10595
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7867693632
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - New Brunswick
Pakistan
USA - California
USA - Florida
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omar Hakim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hakim (CPSO#: 66378 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: 2348 Postmaster Drive
Oakville Ontario L6M 4Z4
(705) 498-9314
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 461-8272

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Woods Road
Valhalla New York 10595
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7867693632
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - New Brunswick
Pakistan
USA - California
USA - Florida
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omar Hakim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hakim (CPSO#: 66378 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: 2348 Postmaster Drive
Oakville Ontario L6M 4Z4
(705) 498-9314
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 461-8272

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD OMAR HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD OMAR HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993