THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:34:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fowler Kennedy Sport
Medicine Clinic
Fanshawe College
London, ontario
London Ontario N5Y 5R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 452-4230
Fax: (519) 452-4415

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Fischer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Fischer (CPSO#: 66391 )
Business Address: 1001 Fanshawe College Boulevard
London Ontario N5Y 5R6
(519) 452-4230
Business Address: Fowler Kennedy Sport Medicine Clinic
3M Building
1151 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6A 3K7
(519) 661-3011

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fowler Kennedy Sport
Medicine Clinic
Fanshawe College
London, ontario
London Ontario N5Y 5R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 452-4230
Fax: (519) 452-4415

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Fischer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Fischer (CPSO#: 66391 )
Business Address: 1001 Fanshawe College Boulevard
London Ontario N5Y 5R6
(519) 452-4230
Business Address: Fowler Kennedy Sport Medicine Clinic
3M Building
1151 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6A 3K7
(519) 661-3011

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA KELLY FISCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISCHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA KELLY FISCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISCHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993