THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:13:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
99 Northfield Drive East
Waterloo Ontario N2K 3P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 585-7527
Fax: (519) 585-7528

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NADIRA HUSEIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Husein (CPSO#: 66395 )
Business Address: 201-99 Northfield Dr E
Waterloo ON N2K 3P9
519-585-7527

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
99 Northfield Drive East
Waterloo Ontario N2K 3P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 585-7527
Fax: (519) 585-7528

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NADIRA HUSEIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Husein (CPSO#: 66395 )
Business Address: 201-99 Northfield Dr E
Waterloo ON N2K 3P9
519-585-7527

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIRA HUSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIRA HUSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993