THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:33:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Family Physicians
122 Cornell Park Avenue
Unit 1
Markham Ontario L6B 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Extension: 221
Fax: (905) 209-1501

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deepti Pasricha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pasricha (CPSO#: 66396 )
Business Address: 1 - 122 Cornell Park Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 1B6
(905) 471-9999
Business Address: 101 - 377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 471-9999

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Family Physicians
122 Cornell Park Avenue
Unit 1
Markham Ontario L6B 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Extension: 221
Fax: (905) 209-1501

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deepti Pasricha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pasricha (CPSO#: 66396 )
Business Address: 1 - 122 Cornell Park Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 1B6
(905) 471-9999
Business Address: 101 - 377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 471-9999

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEEPTI PASRICHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASRICHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEEPTI PASRICHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASRICHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993