THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:50:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ophthalmic Consultant Centres
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 212-9482
Fax: (905) 212-1012
Address: Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
327 Reynold Street
Oakville Ontario L6J 3L7
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Alan Kosaric Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kosaric (CPSO#: 66398 )
Business Address: 1880 Sismet Road
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1W9
9052129482 Extn: 400

Corporation Name: Dr. Alan Kosaric Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kosaric (CPSO#: 66398 )
Business Address: Ophthalmic Consultant Centers
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1W9
(905) 212-9482

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ophthalmic Consultant Centres
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 212-9482
Fax: (905) 212-1012
Address: Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
327 Reynold Street
Oakville Ontario L6J 3L7
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Alan Kosaric Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kosaric (CPSO#: 66398 )
Business Address: 1880 Sismet Road
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1W9
9052129482 Extn: 400

Corporation Name: Dr. Alan Kosaric Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kosaric (CPSO#: 66398 )
Business Address: Ophthalmic Consultant Centers
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1W9
(905) 212-9482

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN KOSARIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSARIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN KOSARIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSARIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993