THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:01:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Craig D. Markle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Markle (CPSO#: 66423 )
Business Address: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Craig D. Markle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Markle (CPSO#: 66423 )
Business Address: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRAIG DOUGLAS MARKLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRAIG DOUGLAS MARKLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993