THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:13:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1568 Ouellette
Windsor Ontario N8X 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-256-4914
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. McGinley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McGinley (CPSO#: 66424 )
Business Address: 1568 Ouellette Ave.
Windsor Ontario N8X 1K7
(519) 256-4914

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1568 Ouellette
Windsor Ontario N8X 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-256-4914
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. McGinley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McGinley (CPSO#: 66424 )
Business Address: 1568 Ouellette Ave.
Windsor Ontario N8X 1K7
(519) 256-4914

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DIARMUID MCGINLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGINLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DIARMUID MCGINLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGINLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993