THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:32:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Whitehills Medical Centre
101-1055 Fanshawe Park Road W
London Ontario
N6G-OW7
London Ontario N6G 2V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 472-0040
Fax: (519) 472-7732

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric H. Nicholls Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Nicholls (CPSO#: 66438 )
Business Address: Whitehills Medical Centre
1225 Wonderland Road North
London Ontario N6G 2V9
(519) 472-0040

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Whitehills Medical Centre
101-1055 Fanshawe Park Road W
London Ontario
N6G-OW7
London Ontario N6G 2V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 472-0040
Fax: (519) 472-7732

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric H. Nicholls Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Nicholls (CPSO#: 66438 )
Business Address: Whitehills Medical Centre
1225 Wonderland Road North
London Ontario N6G 2V9
(519) 472-0040

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC HERBERT NICHOLLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLLS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC HERBERT NICHOLLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLLS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993