THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:18:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Homewood Health
77 City Centre Dr
#604
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 207-0011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CAMH
60 White Squirrel Way, Toronto, ON
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Phone: 416 535 8501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ballon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ballon (CPSO#: 66452 )
Business Address: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
33 Russell Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 2S1
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 4466
Business Address: 10 Jainey Place
North York Ontario M5M 3S5
(416) 484-9655
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 4023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Homewood Health
77 City Centre Dr
#604
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 207-0011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CAMH
60 White Squirrel Way, Toronto, ON
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Phone: 416 535 8501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ballon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ballon (CPSO#: 66452 )
Business Address: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
33 Russell Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 2S1
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 4466
Business Address: 10 Jainey Place
North York Ontario M5M 3S5
(416) 484-9655
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 4023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRUCE CONRAD BALLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRUCE CONRAD BALLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993