THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:16:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 200
440 Boler Road
London Ontario N6K 4L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 471-2929
Fax: (519) 471-1082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Armstrong and Elepano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Elepano (CPSO#: 66460 ) Dr. C. Armstrong (CPSO#: 66765 )
Business Address: 200 - 440 Boler Road
London Ontario N6K 4L2
(519) 471-2929
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
PO Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5G5
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 36360

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 200
440 Boler Road
London Ontario N6K 4L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 471-2929
Fax: (519) 471-1082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Armstrong and Elepano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Elepano (CPSO#: 66460 ) Dr. C. Armstrong (CPSO#: 66765 )
Business Address: 200 - 440 Boler Road
London Ontario N6K 4L2
(519) 471-2929
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
PO Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5G5
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 36360

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA ELEPANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELEPANO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA ELEPANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELEPANO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993